04/19/2024 | Act 383 | |||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Recommitted | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Hopper |