Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024