04/22/2024 | Act 419 | |||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senate Hopper |