Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 13, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024