Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 4, 2022
Fiscal Note March 31, 2022
Fiscal Note February 9, 2022
Fiscal Note January 23, 2022
Bill December 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2022
Analysis April 1, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Bill February 8, 2022
Analysis December 3, 2021