Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HJR91 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 15, 2022
Fiscal Note January 10, 2022
Bill December 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022
Analysis December 30, 2021