House
|
07/11/2024
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
SS S offered & adopted (O'Laughlin)--(4950S.02F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported from S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Removed S Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported from S General Laws Committee - Consent
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S General Laws Committee - Consent vote adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|