Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SB1296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2024
Fiscal Note April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Bill January 4, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024