House
|
05/25/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/25/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Hardin (David), Grego
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR considered
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Ford, Wolfley, Baker, Roberts (Eric), McDugle, Stark, Stearman, Miller, Conley, Townley, Davis, Dempsey, Dills, Moore, Roe, Olsen, Frix, West (Tammy), Luttrell, CrosswhiteHader, Dobrinski, Bashore, West (Kevin), Manger, Steagall, Caldwell (Trey), Hardin (David), Grego, Sims, Sterling, Kendrix, Kerbs, Marti
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Treat, David, Thompson, Hall, Daniels, Floyd, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on States Rights
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Humphrey
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jech
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) ODonnell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Howard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Daniels; authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McBride
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard, Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Culver, Smith, Echols, Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Sims, Luttrell, Russ, Manger, Worthen, Lepak, Roberts (Eric), Gann, Sterling, Roe, Kendrix, Hilbert, Davis, West (Josh), Bashore, West (Kevin), Cornwell, Lowe (Dick), Moore, West (Rick), Grego, May, Townley, Stearman, Olsen, Wolfley, Stark, Dobrinski, Patzkowsky, Talley, Newton, Williams, Miller, West (Tammy), Lawson, Mize, Hill, Hardin (David), Steagall, Fetgatter, Vancuren, Boatman, Hasenbeck, Martinez, Dempsey, Phillips, McEntire, Kerbs, Boles, Dills, Hardin (Tommy), Sneed, Johns, Osburn, Marti, Frix, CrosswhiteHader, Baker, Conley, ODonnell, Strom, Humphrey, Caldwell (Trey), Caldwell (Chad), Burns, Ford, McDugle, Wallace
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Referred to States Rights
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|