Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1236 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 18, 2021