House
|
05/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard, Jett
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Rader, Jech, McCortney, Garvin, Boren, Kirt
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Conley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hill
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Roberts (Eric), Davis, Marti, McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|