Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1752 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021