House | 04/13/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Pederson | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Bullard |