Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1110 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022