Senate | 05/03/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Jason) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Matthews |