Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1370 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022