Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|