Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022