Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
remove as coauthor Representative(s) Johns
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
remove as coauthor Representative(s) Vancuren
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Vancuren
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Johns
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Montgomery, Simpson, Pemberton, Kidd, Dossett (J.J.), Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|