Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB54 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 11, 2021