Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
remove as principal author Representative Talley and substitute with Representative Steagall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Dugger; authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Dugger, Rosino, Weaver, Haste, Floyd, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Dugger
|
|
|