Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB858 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 8, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2021