House
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Burns, Jett, Pugh, Weaver, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Marti
|
|
|