Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1715 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2023