House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named McCortney, Paxton, Floyd, Howard, Montgomery
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on General Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|