Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023