Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Matthews, Bullard, Pederson, Dahm, Stephens, Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Luttrell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Jason) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Matthews
|
|
|