Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023