Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3033 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024