House
|
05/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 24; Ayes: 71 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Strom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Talley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hefner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Baker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Tedford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Staires
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Cantrell
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative George
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Culver
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stinson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative May
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Cornwell
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|