Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024