Senate | 04/08/2024 | Emergency removed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Remove as author Senator Green; authored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Wallace |