Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4086 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024