Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/22/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Alvord
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|