Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1670 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024