Senate | 04/23/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 15 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Deck | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |