Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1786 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill March 25, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024