Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Alvord
|
|
|