Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1959 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024