Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Montgomery, Pugh, Seifried, Dossett, Green, Murdock, Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Rosecrants, Dollens, Randleman, Ford, McDugle, West (Tammy), Hasenbeck, Baker, Sterling, Boles, Provenzano, Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|