Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023