Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Vetoed 06/09/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
remove as principal author Representative Martinez and substitute with Representative Echols
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
remove as principal author Representative Marti and substitute with Representative Martinez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Garvin, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Paxton, Daniels, Boren, Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 21; Ayes: 65 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|