Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB437 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023