Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|