Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023