Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 83 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vetoed 04/26/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
SCs named McCortney, Pugh, Paxton, Murdock, Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|