Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB840 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023