Senate | 05/16/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 128 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 128 | |
Senate | 11/18/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/18/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |