Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB247 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 247
 (In the Senate - Filed November 18, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 1, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2; May 1, 2017, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 247 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to funding sources for the repayment of certain
 speech-language pathologist and audiologist education loans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.9818, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.9818.  PROGRAM FUNDING. (a)  The program may be
 funded [solely] from:
 (1)  gifts, grants, and donations solicited and
 accepted by the board for the purposes of this subchapter; and
 (2)  a portion of the fees collected under Chapter 51,
 Occupations Code, as determined under Subsection (b).
 (b)  The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation by rule
 may, in consultation with the advisory board established under
 Subchapter C, Chapter 401, Occupations Code, provide that a portion
 of the fees collected under Chapter 51, Occupations Code, from
 persons regulated under Chapter 401, Occupations Code, may be
 allocated to fund the program, provided that the portion is in an
 amount that does not result in an increase in fees paid under
 Chapter 51, Occupations Code, by those persons.
 SECTION 2.  A rule adopted under Section 61.9818(b),
 Education Code, as added by this Act, may not take effect earlier
 than the fiscal year beginning September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *