1 | 1 | | By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 247 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed November 18, 2016; January 30, 2017, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 1, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 2; May 1, 2017, sent |
---|
6 | 6 | | to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 247 By: Menéndez |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to funding sources for the repayment of certain |
---|
13 | 13 | | speech-language pathologist and audiologist education loans. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 61.9818, Education Code, is amended to |
---|
16 | 16 | | read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 61.9818. PROGRAM FUNDING. (a) The program may be |
---|
18 | 18 | | funded [solely] from: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) gifts, grants, and donations solicited and |
---|
20 | 20 | | accepted by the board for the purposes of this subchapter; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) a portion of the fees collected under Chapter 51, |
---|
22 | 22 | | Occupations Code, as determined under Subsection (b). |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation by rule |
---|
24 | 24 | | may, in consultation with the advisory board established under |
---|
25 | 25 | | Subchapter C, Chapter 401, Occupations Code, provide that a portion |
---|
26 | 26 | | of the fees collected under Chapter 51, Occupations Code, from |
---|
27 | 27 | | persons regulated under Chapter 401, Occupations Code, may be |
---|
28 | 28 | | allocated to fund the program, provided that the portion is in an |
---|
29 | 29 | | amount that does not result in an increase in fees paid under |
---|
30 | 30 | | Chapter 51, Occupations Code, by those persons. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. A rule adopted under Section 61.9818(b), |
---|
32 | 32 | | Education Code, as added by this Act, may not take effect earlier |
---|
33 | 33 | | than the fiscal year beginning September 1, 2019. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
35 | 35 | | * * * * * |
---|